網頁2024年3月4日 · Stephen has made over 50 trades of the Dine Brands Global Inc stock since 2011, according to the Form 4 filled with the SEC. Most recently he exercised 2,270 … 網頁"Our rebrand to Dine Brands from DineEquity Inc. represents the most recent step in our transformation and our return to growth," said Stephen P. Joyce, Chief Executive Officer of Dine Brands. "Over the past year, we have made targeted changes at both the corporate and brand levels to continue executing on our new strategic plan.
Stephen P. Joyce - CEO & Director at CARE The Org
網頁2024年2月21日 · CNBC's "Power Lunch" team is joined by Dine Brands CEO Stephen Joyce, the company that owns IHOP and Applebee's, to discuss its earnings beat. 04:22 Thu, Feb 21 2024 4:01 PM EST 網頁Stephen P. Joyce was appointed a director of RE/MAX Holdings, Inc. in April 2024. Mr. Joyce is currently the CEO of Dine Brands, the full-service dining company and … chms ophtalmo
Dine Brands Global: Explaining the Restaurant Brands - Skift Table
網頁2024年7月24日 · By 2024, sales were in a free-fall, dropping more than $600 million to $4.4 billion. Julia Stewart, longtime CEO of parent company Dine Brands Global, resigned and Applebee’s had been without a brand president since Steven Layt’s own resignation in … 網頁Prior to joining RE/MAX, Mr. Joyce served as CEO of Dine Brands Global from September 2024 through February 2024. A member of the Board of Directors of Dine Brands Global … Stephen P. Joyce (born c. 1961) is an American Business man. He was the chief executive officer of Dine Brands Global, the operator of IHOP and Applebee's franchises. Currently serves as CEO and Director of Re/Max International. gravel roof maintenance